This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 09:06:05 (UTC).

Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD v. Bexar County Hospital District, et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Francesco R Sebastiani, DMD filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Bexar County Hospital District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01093

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francesco r Sebastiani

Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD

Defendants

bexar county hospital district dba university health system

University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio

William L. Henrich

Dr. peter loomer

DDS daniel perez

William L. Henrich, M.D.

Peter Loomer, DDS

Daniel Perez, DDS

Bexar County Hospital District d/b/a University Health System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theodore C. Anderson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore

3109 Carlisle Street

Dallas, TX 75204

John Henry Crouch, IV

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore, PLLC

3109 Carlisle Street

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Cristina M. Moreno

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548 Capital Station

Austin, TX 78711

Hailey Mignon Martin Mullican

Attorney at Ihfe & Associates, P.C.

One Castle Hills, 1100 N.W. Loop 410, Suite 500

San Antonio, TX 78213

Laura Anne Cavaretta

Attorney at Cavaretta, Katona & Leighner, PLLC

One Riverwalk Place, 700 North St. Mary'S St., Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78205

Erin Rebecca McNiece

Attorney at Caveretta, Katona & Leighner, PLLC

One Riverwalk Place, 700 N. St. Mary'S St., Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78205

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Bexar County Hospital District. (McNiece, Erin) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#18

(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD.(Crouch, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

17 #1

Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

#17

(#17) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD, re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bexar County Hospital District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Crouch, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cristina M. Moreno on behalf of William L. Henrich, M.D., Peter Loomer, DDS, Daniel Perez, DDS, University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio. Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party William L. Henrich, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party Peter Loomer, DDS(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party Daniel Perez, DDS(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio(pty:dft) (Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER AND ADVISORY - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Bexar County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNiece, Erin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD as to All Defendants. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Bexar County Hospital District. (rg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Francesco r Sebastiani. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13965159). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Francesco r Sebastiani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Bexar County Hospital District. (McNiece, Erin) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD.(Crouch, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD, re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bexar County Hospital District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Crouch, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cristina M. Moreno on behalf of William L. Henrich, M.D., Peter Loomer, DDS, Daniel Perez, DDS, University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio. Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party William L. Henrich, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party Peter Loomer, DDS(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party Daniel Perez, DDS(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina M. Moreno added to party University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio(pty:dft) (Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER AND ADVISORY - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Bexar County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNiece, Erin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD as to All Defendants. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to William L. Henrich, M.D. (rg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio. (rg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Peter Loomer, DDS. (rg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Bexar County Hospital District. (rg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francesco R. Sebastiani, DMD. (Crouch, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Francesco r Sebastiani. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13965159). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Francesco r Sebastiani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON (THE) is a litigant

Latest cases where BEXAR COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT D/B/A UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Anne Cavaretta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cristina M Moreno