This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2019 at 07:47:25 (UTC).

Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc. v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Seasons Hospice Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24440

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc.

P.O. Box 391

Tallahassee, FL 32302

Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida

Defendants

Secretary Alex M. Azar, II

Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel John Walenz

Attorney at Ausley McMullen

123 S. Calhoun St.

Tallahassee, FL 32311

Danielle E. Marocchi

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c.,

1000 North Water Street, Suite 1700

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Michael Joseph Glazer

Attorney at Ausley McMullen

123 S Calhoun St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Bryan Nowicki

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c.

22 East Mifflin Street, Suite 700

Madison, WI 53703

Thomas M. Burnett

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c.

1000 North Water Street, Suite 1700

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Certification

15 #1

Certification

#15

(#15) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

14 #2

Certification

14 #1

Certification

#14

(#14) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

13 #2

Certification

13 #1

Certification

#13

(#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #1

Certification Certification

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas M. Burnett. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12164046 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

7 #1

Certification Certification

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle E. Marocchi. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12164023 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

6 #1

Certification Certification

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting, ECF No. #8 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas M. Burnett. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting, ECF No. #7 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Danielle E. Marocchi. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting, ECF No. #6 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Bryan Nowicki. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas M. Burnett. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12164046 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle E. Marocchi. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12164023 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bryan Nowicki. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12163872 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Joseph Glazer on behalf of Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Attorney Michael Joseph Glazer added to party Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida(pty:pla). (Glazer, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kpe) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12101446, filed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(Walenz, Samuel) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas M Burnett