This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 07:47:41 (UTC).

Sears v. BOP

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Sears filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against BOP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gina M. Groh and Robert W. Trumble. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00181

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott A. Sears

Bridgeport, OH 43912

Defendant

BOP

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Court-Approved Form

2 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/4/2021. (tlg) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Other Document filed by Scott A. Sears. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 1/7/2022. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (je). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/4/2021. (tlg) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM EVIDENCE LETTER WHEELING HOSPITAL by Scott A. Sears. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BOP, filed by Scott A. Sears. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and PSLC Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOP is a litigant