This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 07:09:25 (UTC).

Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC v. MG Management CO., LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MG Management CO , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02207

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC

Respondents

MG Management CO., LLC

Matthew Goforth

Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC

Malinda Goforth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen C. Jarvis

Attorney at Cheng Cohen LLC

363 West Erie Street, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60654

Allison Renee Grow

Attorney at Cheng Cohen LLC

311 N. Aberdeen Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60607

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: For the telephonic initial status hearing on July 17, 2020, counsel are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/3/2020: Based on a review of the docket, it appears that no Defendant has yet answered the complaint. Given the various extensions of deadlines effected by recent District-wide general orders, it may be unclear to Defendants when they must respond to the complaint. For the sake of clarity and to ensure efficiency, the Court orders that defendants shall answer the complaint on or before June 19, 2020. Telephonic initial status hearing set for July 17, 2020 at 10:15 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to MG Management CO., LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Matthew Goforth on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Malinda Goforth on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL CASES. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (td, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC by Stephen C. Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC Petitioner's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC by Allison Renee Grow (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Award on Appeal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Order on Renewed Motion for Interim Injunctive Relief

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Petition to Confirm Interim Award of Injunctive Relief filed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16920027. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order on Renewed Motion for Interim Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Award on Appeal)(Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: For the telephonic initial status hearing on July 17, 2020, counsel are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/3/2020: Based on a review of the docket, it appears that no Defendant has yet answered the complaint. Given the various extensions of deadlines effected by recent District-wide general orders, it may be unclear to Defendants when they must respond to the complaint. For the sake of clarity and to ensure efficiency, the Court orders that defendants shall answer the complaint on or before June 19, 2020. Telephonic initial status hearing set for July 17, 2020 at 10:15 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to MG Management CO., LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Matthew Goforth on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Malinda Goforth on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL CASES. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Respondents Malinda Goforth, Matthew Goforth, MG Management CO., LLC, Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC. (ng, ) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (td, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC by Stephen C. Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC Petitioner's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC by Allison Renee Grow (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition to Confirm Interim Award of Injunctive Relief filed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16920027. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order on Renewed Motion for Interim Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Award on Appeal)(Grow, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less