This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:35:31 (UTC).

Searles, Trevor v. Bryden Motors Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Searles, Trevor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bryden Motors Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trevor Searles

Defendant

Bryden Motors Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Emanuel Kraus

Attorney at Ken Kraus Law, LLC

215 Glen Hollow Road

Madison, WI 53705

Defendant Attorney

Agatha K. Raynor

Attorney at Crivello Carlson, S.C.

710 North Plankinton Avenue, Suite 500

Milwaukee, WI 53203

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kraus, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Agatha K. Raynor for Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Bryden Motors Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Kraus, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bryden Motors Inc. (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Trevor Searles. (Kraus, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Letter dated April 13, 2018

1 #5

Exhibit E - E-mail dated September 4, 2018

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Right to Sue

1 #3

Exhibit C - Order of Dismissal

1 #2

Exhibit B - Initial Determination - Probable Cause

1 #1

Exhibit A - Discrimination Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bryden Motors Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391190.), filed by Trevor Searles, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discrimination Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Initial Determination - Probable Cause, #3 Exhibit C - Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Right to Sue, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail dated September 4, 2018, #6 Exhibit F - Letter dated April 13, 2018, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Kraus, Kenneth) Modified on 1/11/2019: Added exhibit descriptions. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/2019 [:10] (cak) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kraus, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 2/21/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Agatha K. Raynor for Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Bryden Motors Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Kraus, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Bryden Motors Inc. (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Trevor Searles. (Kraus, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bryden Motors Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391190.), filed by Trevor Searles, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discrimination Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Initial Determination - Probable Cause, #3 Exhibit C - Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Right to Sue, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail dated September 4, 2018, #6 Exhibit F - Letter dated April 13, 2018, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Kraus, Kenneth) Modified on 1/11/2019: Added exhibit descriptions. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.