This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 08:21:38 (UTC).

Gouthro v. Tesla Motors Inc

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Gouthro filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Tesla Motors Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gouthro Sean

Sean Gouthro

Defendant

Tesla Motors Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel R Watkins

Attorney at Watkins and Letofsky

8215 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 265

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Joseph Ortuno

Attorney at Watkins & Letofsky

8215 S. Eastern Ave, Ste.265

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant Attorneys

Crane M Pomerantz

Attorney at SklarWilliams, PLLC

410 S. Rampart Blvd., Suite 350

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Anne Virginia Dunne

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Two Seaport Lane Ste 300

Boston, MA 02210-2028

Christopher F Robertson

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Two Seaport Lane Ste 300

Boston, MA 02210-2028

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #6 , #7 Tesla's Motion to Compel Arbitration, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending resolution of the claims which must be arbitrated. Upon conclusion of arbitration, the parties shall jointly file a notice with the Court addressing the need for additional proceedings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#9

(#9) NON-OPPOSITION to #6 Motion by Plaintiff Sean Gouthro. (Ortuno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Pomerantz, Crane) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Gouthro re #3 Summons Issued. Tesla Motors Inc served on 2/25/2020. (Ortuno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Tesla Motors Inc re #1 Complaint. (JQC) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gouthro Sean. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ortuno, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet CCS

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Tesla Motors Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5882696) by Gouthro Sean. Proof of service due by 5/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons Summons) (Watkins, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #6 , #7 Tesla's Motion to Compel Arbitration, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending resolution of the claims which must be arbitrated. Upon conclusion of arbitration, the parties shall jointly file a notice with the Court addressing the need for additional proceedings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NON-OPPOSITION to #6 Motion by Plaintiff Sean Gouthro. (Ortuno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher F. Robertson and Anne V. Dunne to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/2/2020. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Pomerantz, Crane) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) VIEW #7 corrected image to First MOTION To Compel Arbitration by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. Responses due by 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Pomerantz, Crane) Modified on 3/18/2020 (MMM). / (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Gouthro re #3 Summons Issued. Tesla Motors Inc served on 2/25/2020. (Ortuno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Tesla Motors Inc re #1 Complaint. (JQC) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gouthro Sean. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ortuno, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tesla Motors Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5882696) by Gouthro Sean. Proof of service due by 5/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons Summons) (Watkins, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less