This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:50:51 (UTC).

Sean Jeffrey Richson v. K. Clark

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Sean Jeffrey Richson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against K Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09695

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sean Jeffrey Richson

Corcoran, CA 93212

Respondent

K. Clark

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (see document for details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

2 #2

CV-69 IFP

2 #1

CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 CV-69 IFP) (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Sean Jeffrey Richson. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Eastern District of California, 1:20-cv-01502 filed 10/23/2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (see document for details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 CV-69 IFP) (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Sean Jeffrey Richson. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less