This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 07:14:19 (UTC).

Seaman v. Seneca County/Board of County Commissioners et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Seaman filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Seneca County/Board of County Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02962

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Seaman

Defendants

Sheriff William E. Eckelberry

Officer Branson

Officer B Brooks

Officer Barton

John and Jane Does

Seneca County/Board of County Commissioners

Officer Castanien

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D. Bell

Attorney at Gallon, Takacs, Boissoneault & Schaffer

3516 Granite Circle

Toledo, OH 43617

Kevin J. Boissoneault

Attorney at Gallon, Takacs, Boissoneault & Schaffer

3516 Granite Circle

Toledo, OH 43617

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer A. McHugh

Attorney at Spengler Nathanson - Toledo

900 Adams Street

Toledo, OH 43604

Teresa L. Grigsby

Attorney at Spengler Nathanson - Toledo

900 Adams Street

Toledo, OH 43604

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Common Pleas Court of Seneca County, Ohio, case number 19-CV-0357 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9692628.. Filed by Officer Branson, William E. Eckelberry, Officer Barton, Seneca County/Board of Commissioners, Officer Castanien, Officer B Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Seneca County Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Grigsby, Teresa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/23/2019. (M,L) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Motion for extension of time until move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to answer filed by Officer Barton, Officer Branson, Officer B Brooks, Officer Castanien, William E. Eckelberry, Seneca County/Board of Commissioners. (Grigsby, Teresa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/14/20. Plaintiff granted leave to file an Amended Complaint by 2/28/20. If Plaintiff decides not to file an Amended Complaint, counsel should promptly contact Chambers. Counsel shall also work to clean up any issues regarding service of Defendants. Once the dust settles, Court will schedule a further Phone Status to discuss the setting of a Case Management Conference. In the interim, Defendants' Answer date is extended and will be discussed at the next Phone Status. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/15/20. (S,Na) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Seneca County Complaint

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/14/20. Plaintiff granted leave to file an Amended Complaint by 2/28/20. If Plaintiff decides not to file an Amended Complaint, counsel should promptly contact Chambers. Counsel shall also work to clean up any issues regarding service of Defendants. Once the dust settles, Court will schedule a further Phone Status to discuss the setting of a Case Management Conference. In the interim, Defendants' Answer date is extended and will be discussed at the next Phone Status. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/15/20. (S,Na) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 1/14/20 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting #2 Motion for extension of time until 2/18/2020 to Answer. Officers Barton, Branson, Brooks, Castanien, William E. Eckelberry, Seneca County/Board of County Commissioners - Answer now due 2/18/2020. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/30/2019.(D,L) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/23/2019. (M,L) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for extension of time until move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to answer filed by Officer Barton, Officer Branson, Officer B Brooks, Officer Castanien, William E. Eckelberry, Seneca County/Board of Commissioners. (Grigsby, Teresa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Common Pleas Court of Seneca County, Ohio, case number 19-CV-0357 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9692628.. Filed by Officer Branson, William E. Eckelberry, Officer Barton, Seneca County/Board of Commissioners, Officer Castanien, Officer B Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Seneca County Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Grigsby, Teresa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.