Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2021 at 07:58:57 (UTC).

Seals v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Seals filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01631

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leah A. Seals

Defendants

Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company

Eplus, Inc

The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan

The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amar Bharat Raval

Attorney at Berg Plummer Johnson Raval

3700 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77098

Lee Price Fernon, Jr.

Attorney at Sinclair Law Firm, LLC

2000 Southbridge Parkway, Suite 601

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Benjamin Baker

Attorney at Maynard Cooper et al

1901 6Th Avenue North, Ste 2400

Birmingham, AB 35203

William B Wahlheim, Jr

Attorney at Maynard Cooper et al

1901 Sixth Avenue N, Ste 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Baker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER - Granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint ; Answer due for Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company 6/25/2021; The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc 6/25/2021. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER - Granting #16 Motion for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Baker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

7 #3

Continuation

7 #2

Continuation

7 #1

Continuation

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Eplus, Inc, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Baker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Baker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER - Granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint ; Answer due for Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company 6/25/2021; The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc 6/25/2021. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER - Granting #16 Motion for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Baker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Eplus, Inc served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER - Granting #11 Motion for Lee P. Fernon, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leah A. Seals. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Lee P. Fernon, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah A. Seals, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2021. (Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Leah A. Seals, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Eplus, Inc, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eplus, Inc, Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Eplus Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26457198) filed by Leah A. Seals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ePlus Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amar B. Raval