This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:30:11 (UTC).

SEALE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 SEALE filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anne E. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21016

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne E. Thompson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARTHUR D. SEALE

Ayer, MA 01432

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

R. DAVID WALK, JR

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

401 Market Street, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 2098

Camden, NJ 08101

JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER that within 60 days of the date of the entry of this Order, the United States shall electronically file and serve and answer to the 2255 motion. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 01/28/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS terminated. Attorney R. DAVID WALK, JR for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (WALK, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#5

(#5) Letter regarding filings filed by Arthur D. Seale. (jmh) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter and supporting documents regarding case filed by Arthur D. Seale. (jmh) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

3 #4

Envelope

3 #3

Attachment 3

3 #2

Attatchment 2

3 #1

Attachment 1

#3

(#3) Letter and supporting documents filed by Arthur D. Seale. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attatchment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Envelope)(jmh) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN GAY terminated. Attorney JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (MANIS, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #1

COA ORDER

#1

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that within 60 days of the date of the entry of this Order, the United States shall electronically file and serve and answer to the 2255 motion. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 01/28/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS terminated. Attorney R. DAVID WALK, JR for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (WALK, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter regarding filings filed by Arthur D. Seale. (jmh) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter and supporting documents regarding case filed by Arthur D. Seale. (jmh) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter and supporting documents filed by Arthur D. Seale. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attatchment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Envelope)(jmh) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN GAY terminated. Attorney JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (MANIS, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less