This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2019 at 07:02:01 (UTC).

Seagraves v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 10/26/2019 Seagraves filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Dallas Seagraves

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Interested Party

SSA-Email Notification

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donna Simpson

Attorney at Law Office of Donna Simpson

51 E First Street, P O Box 2327

Cookeville, TN 38502

Defendant Attorney

Jeremiah D. Hayes

Attorney at Social Security Administration

601 East 12Th Street, Room 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within twenty-eight (28) days of entry of this Order. The plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of the defendant's responsive brief to file a reply brief, if necessary. The reply brief shall not exceed five (5) pages absent permission from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/30/2019. (am) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment based on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion within twenty-eight (28) days of entry of this Order. The plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of the defendant's responsive brief to file a reply brief, if necessary. The reply brief shall not exceed five (5) pages absent permission from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SSA Administrative Record filed per #12 Answer to Social Security Complaint.. (Hayes, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Social Security Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Hayes, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah D. Hayes on behalf of Social Security Administration (Hayes, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (am) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS returned executed Social Security Administration served on 11/4/2019. (am) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney General, served on 11/7/2019. (jm) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 11/1/2019. (am) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons issued as to Social Security Administration.(Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/30/2019. (am) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Donna Simpson. (am) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Dallas Seagraves. (am) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0), filed by Michael Dallas Seagraves. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.