This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:34:48 (UTC).

Scurlark v. Quality Asset Recovery, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Scurlark filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Quality Asset Recovery, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jason K. Pulliam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01242

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eural Scurlark

Defendant

Quality Asset Recovery, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mohammed O. Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Ave, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorney

Jason R. Jobe

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP

700 N. Pearl Street, Ste 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Quality Asset Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jobe, Jason) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eural Scurlark as to Quality Asset Recovery, LLC. Waiver sent on 10/23/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mohammed O. Badwan on behalf of Eural Scurlark (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14090053), filed by Eural Scurlark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Quality Asset Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jobe, Jason) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eural Scurlark as to Quality Asset Recovery, LLC. Waiver sent on 10/23/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mohammed O. Badwan on behalf of Eural Scurlark (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14090053), filed by Eural Scurlark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mohammed Omar Badwan