This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 07:57:18 (UTC).

SCRUGGS v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 SCRUGGS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06711

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID LEE SCRUGGS

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ben C. Martin

Attorney at MARTIN BAUGHMAN, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Thomas W. Arbon

Attorney at MARTIN BAUGHMAN, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK DENMARK HOLDINGS APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC, COOK NEDERLAND BV, COOK RESEARCH INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-06089-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00426-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDINGS APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC, COOK NEDERLAND BV, COOK RESEARCH INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-06089-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00426-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Arbon on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS, MDL Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (Arbon, Thomas) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Ben C. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS, MDL Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by DAVID LEE SCRUGGS.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#5

(#10) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/7/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

9 #1

*Restricted*

9 #9

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-187) Transferring Case to the Southern District of Indiana Re MDL-2570.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/12/2022. (RMV) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff David Lee Scruggs. (Stoller, Paul) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK DENMARK HOLDINGS APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC, COOK NEDERLAND BV, COOK RESEARCH INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-06089-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00426-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDINGS APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC, COOK NEDERLAND BV, COOK RESEARCH INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-06089-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00426-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Arbon on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS, MDL Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (Arbon, Thomas) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Ben C. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS, MDL Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB (Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SEALED Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Fraudulent Concealment Claim, re (21326 in 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 12 in 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB) Amended Complaint, filed by MDL Plaintiff DAVID LEE SCRUGGS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by DAVID LEE SCRUGGS.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#11) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Arizona, Cause No. 2:22-cv-58 on 2/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6711-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 8:22-cv-84 on 2/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6712-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of New York, Cause No. 1:22-cv-55 on 2/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6713-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Ohio, Cause No. 3:21-cv-2255 on 2/4/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6714-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Ohio, Cause No. 4:22-cv-78 on 2/7/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6715-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 1:22-cv-28 on 2/7/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-2716-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06712-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06713-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06714-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/7/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:22-cv-00058. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRemark: Case Transferred to the Southern District of Indiana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-187) Transferring Case to the Southern District of Indiana Re MDL-2570.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/12/2022. (RMV) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff David Lee Scruggs. (Stoller, Paul) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by David Lee Scruggs. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20239581. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-0058-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by David Lee Scruggs. (Stoller, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20239581 filed by David Lee Scruggs. (Stoller, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald