This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 08:42:56 (UTC).

SCROGGINS v.COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 SCROGGINS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06850

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBORAH J. SCOGGINS

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Louis Kinsman

Attorney at KRAUSE & KINSMAN LLC

4717 Grand Ave., Suite 250

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Transmittal Letter Designation of Trial

#2

(#2) TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Indiana (MDL 2570). Signed by deputy clerk on 07/20/2022. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

3 #3

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

3 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/29/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#9

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#10

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DEBORAH SCOGGINS.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff DEBORAH SCOGGINS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff DEBORAH SCOGGINS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DEBORAH SCOGGINS.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Kansas, Cause No. 2:22-cv-2237 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6850-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 1:22-cv-1628 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6851-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 1:22-cv-11415 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6852-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 5:22-cv-1670 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6853-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Texas, Cause No. 7:22-cv-209 on 7/29/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6854-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06853-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/29/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:22-cv-02237. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Indiana (MDL 2570). Signed by deputy clerk on 07/20/2022. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry). (jsh) [Transferred from Kansas on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Kansas on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5804796.), filed by Deborah Scoggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter Designation of Trial)(Kinsman, Robert) [Transferred from Kansas on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald