This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:55:36 (UTC).

Scramoge Technology Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On January 10, 2022, Scramoge Technology Limited (“Plaintiff” or “Scramoge”), represented by Brett E. Cooper, Drew Bennett Hollander, Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, and Seth Raymond Hasenour of Russ August & Kabat, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (“SEC”), and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (“SEA”) (collectively, “Defendants” or “Samsung”) seeking damages along with pre- and post-judgement interest for the alleged infringement of United States Patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas.

 

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent Nos. 9,461,364 (“the ’364 Patent”), 10,153,666 (“the ’666 Patent”), 9,601,269 (“the ’269 Patent”), 10,491,043 (“the ’043 Patent”), 10,476,160 (“the ’160 Patent”), 10,461,426 (“the ’426 Patent”), and 10,727,592 (“the ’592 Patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”) owned by Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “On information and belief, Samsung has and continues to make, use, offer for sale, sell, and/or import certain products and services, including without limitation the Galaxy sub- models S7, S7 Edge, S8, Note 8, S9, Note 9, S9+, S10, S10e, S10+, S10 5G, Note 10, Note 10+, Note 10+ 5G, S20, S20 5G, S20+, S20+ 5G, S20 Ultra LTE/5G, Note 20, Note 20 5G, Note 20 Ultra 5G, S21, S21+, S21 Ultra, Fold, Z Flip, Z Flip 5G, Z Fold2 5G, Z Fold3 5G, and Z Flip3 5G (“Accused Products”), that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims of the ’364 Patent. By making, using, offering for sale, selling and/or importing into the United States the Accused Products, Samsung has injured Plaintiff.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that, “On information and belief, Samsung has and continues to make, use, offer for sale, sell, and/or import certain products and services, including without limitation the Galaxy sub- models S7, S7 Edge, S8, Note 8, S9, Note 9, S9+, S10e, S10, S10+, S10 5G, Note 10, Note 10+, Note 10+ 5G, S20, S20 5G, S20+, S20+ 5G, S20 Ultra LTE/5G, Note 20, Note 20 5G, Note 20 Ultra 5G, S21, S21+, S21 Ultra, Fold, Z Flip, Z Flip 5G, Z Fold2 5G, Z Fold3 5G, and Z Flip3 5G (“Accused Products”), that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims of the ’666 Patent. By making, using, offering for sale, selling and/or importing into the United States the Accused Products, Samsung has injured Plaintiff.”

 

Similar allegations have been made by Plaintiff with respect to the other Asserted Patents owned by Plaintiff.

 

There are seven claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff which deals with the alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents owned by Plaintiff.

 

In its prayer for relief Plaintiff has requested the court for a judgment in favor of Plaintiff that Samsung has infringed, either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Asserted Patents owned by Plaintiff, an order requiring Samsung to pay Plaintiff its damages (past, present, and future), costs, expenses, and prejudgment and post-judgment interest, and an order finding that this is an exceptional case within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285. Further, Plaintiff requested the court to award Plaintiff its reasonable attorneys’ fees along with any and all other relief as the court may deem appropriate and just under the circumstances.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scramoge Technology Ltd.

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Seth Raymond Hasenour

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brett E Cooper

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew Bennett Hollander

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 4/14/2022; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

9 #1

Summons(es)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Hasenour, Seth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Drew Bennett Hollander on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Hollander, Drew) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett E Cooper on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8740373.), filed by Scramoge Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

16 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 4/14/2022; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Hasenour, Seth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Drew Bennett Hollander on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Hollander, Drew) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett E Cooper on behalf of Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Scramoge Technology Ltd. re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8740373.), filed by Scramoge Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith