This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:57:41 (UTC).

Scramoge Technology Ltd. v. Belkin International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Scramoge Technology Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Belkin International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08035

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.

Defendant

Belkin International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brett E. Cooper

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew B. Hollander

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Seth R. Hasenour

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

607 Terrell Hill B

Austin, TX 78704

Defendant Attorney

Daniel B. Heidtke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #31 , by Judge David O. Carter. Defendant Belkin International, Inc. answer due 1/3/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

31 #1

Proposed Order

31 #31

Main Document

#30

(#30) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Belkin International, Inc. answer now due 12/6/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Belkin International, Inc..(Attorney Daniel B. Heidtke added to party Belkin International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#29

(#29) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/22/2021. (twdb) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/21/2021, Receipt No. 32193630) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect case number is listed on proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

26 #2

Proposed Order

26 #1

Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing

26 #26

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #31 , by Judge David O. Carter. Defendant Belkin International, Inc. answer due 1/3/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 3, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Belkin International, Inc. answer now due 12/6/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Belkin International, Inc..(Attorney Daniel B. Heidtke added to party Belkin International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/22/2021. (twdb) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/21/2021, Receipt No. 32193630) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect case number is listed on proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING by Judge David O. Carter APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/21/2021, Receipt No. 32193630) #26 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/21/2021, Receipt No. 32193630) filed by Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Conkle, Christian) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Text Only Order re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #24 . Counsel are directed to correct the deficiencies in the Notice of Deficiency by November 5, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32193630) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.2(a) Applicant resides in California. Case information is incorrect. Application has incorrect DJ and MJ initials. Case number, DJ and MJ initials proposed order are incorrect. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32193630) filed by Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD., (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32123893 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel B Heidtke