This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 10:18:29 (UTC).

Scramoge Technology Ltd. v. Anker Innovations Ltd.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Scramoge Technology Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Anker Innovations Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01712

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.

Defendants

ANKER INNOVATIONS LTD.

Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brett E. Cooper

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew B. Hollander

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Seth R. Hasenour

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

607 Terrell Hill B

Austin, TX 78704

Defendant Attorney

Christopher S Marchese

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

633 West 5Th Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #31 by Judge David O. Carter. Extended up to and including 2/7/22. (twdb) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#32

(#32) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

31 #1

Proposed Order

31 #31

Main Document

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher S Marchese on behalf of Defendants Anker Innovations Ltd., Fantasia Trading LLC (Attorney Christopher S Marchese added to party Anker Innovations Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Marchese added to party Fantasia Trading LLC(pty:dft))(Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

28 #2

Proposed Order

28 #1

Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing

28 #28

Main Document

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32193594) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.2(a) Applicant resides in California. Case information is incorrect. DJ and MJ initials are not incorrect on application and proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #31 by Judge David O. Carter. Extended up to and including 2/7/22. (twdb) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fantasia Trading LLC answer now due 2/7/2022; Anker Innovations Ltd. answer now due 2/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Fantasia Trading LLC; Anker Innovations Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher S Marchese on behalf of Defendants Anker Innovations Ltd., Fantasia Trading LLC (Attorney Christopher S Marchese added to party Anker Innovations Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Marchese added to party Fantasia Trading LLC(pty:dft))(Marchese, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING by Judge David O. Carter APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/21/2021, Receipt No. 32193594) #28 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/21/2021, Receipt No. 32193594) filed by Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Conkle, Christian) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Text Only Order re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #26 . Counsel are directed to correct the deficiencies in the Notice of Deficiencies by November 5, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32193594) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.2(a) Applicant resides in California. Case information is incorrect. DJ and MJ initials are not incorrect on application and proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth R. Hasenour to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32193594) filed by Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd., upon Defendant Fantasia Trading LLC served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ROY R. STANLEY, Agent for Service of Process of FANTASIA TRADING LLC D/B/A ANKERDIRECT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD., (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32124343 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect is a litigant

Latest cases where Anker Innovations Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S. Marchese