This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:49:25 (UTC).

Scoyni v. United States District Court of Idaho 9th Circuit

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Scoyni filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States District Court of Idaho 9th Circuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candy W. Dale and David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Candy W. Dale

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas D Scoyni

Caldwell, ID 83605

Defendant

United States district court Idaho 9th circuit

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney attn: civil clerk by Nicholas D Scoyni. Served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (jd)

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for violation of civil rights against United States district court Idaho 9th circuit, filed by Nicholas D Scoyni. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(jd)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States district court Idaho 9th circuit, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney attn: civil clerk by Nicholas D Scoyni. Served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00232-DCN. (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#3) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Upon review of the complaint and the nature of the allegations, and to further the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action, the Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to the Honorable David C. Nye for disposition. The Clerk is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • RECEIPT: filing fee Fee Received $ 400, receipt # IDX100024440 final payment (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to United States district court Idaho 9th circuit, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for violation of civil rights against United States district court Idaho 9th circuit, filed by Nicholas D Scoyni. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.