This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:43:42 (UTC).

Scoville v. Kroger Limited Partnership I et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Scoville filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Limited Partnership I. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Scoville

Defendants

Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger

Benenson Bryn Mawr, LLC d/b/a Benenson Capital Partners, LLC

Michael Goodrow

Kroger Limited Partnership I doing business as Kroger doing business as Gayton Crossing Kroger

Benenson Bryn Mawr, LLC doing business as Benenson Capital Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Hubbard Taylor

Attorney at FloranceGordonBrown

901 E Cary Street, Ste 1900

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

Jon Allon Nichols, Jr.

Attorney at Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman

Po Box 70280

Richmond, VA 23255

Angela R. MacFarlane

Attorney at Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman

P.O. Box 70280

Richmond, VA 23255

Stanley Paul Wellman

Attorney at Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman

Po Box 70280

Richmond, VA 23255

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8183598.), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nichols, Jon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/7/2022) (adun, ). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger. (Nichols, Jon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Declaration of Erik Lutson by Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger. (Nichols, Jon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 26 Disclosure by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (MacFarlane, Angela) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#5

(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Brian Scoville. (Taylor, John) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Rule 26 Disclosure by Brian Scoville. (Taylor, John) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rule 26 Disclosure by Brian Scoville. (Taylor, John) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Brian Scoville. (Taylor, John) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 26 Disclosure by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (MacFarlane, Angela) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (adun, ) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Erik Lutson by Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger. (Nichols, Jon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger. (Nichols, Jon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8183598.), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I d/b/a Kroger d/b/a Gayton Crossing Kroger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nichols, Jon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/7/2022) (adun, ). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Limited Partnership I and doing business as Kroger is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon Allon Nichols Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stanley Paul Wellman Esq.