This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:31:34 (UTC).

Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Salacinski et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Scottsdale Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Salacinski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00096

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Defendants

Sal Construction LLC

Christian Salacinski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leah T. Handelman

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

Bradley J. Luck

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

Defendant Attorney

Stephen E. Woodruff

Attorney at HUPPERT SWINDLEHURST & WOODRUFF, PC

Box 523, 420 S Second Street

Livingston, MT 59047

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Sal Construction LLC, Christian Salacinski. (Woodruff, Stephen) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE UPON CONSENT TO USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDH) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDH) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

(#8) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Stephen E. Woodruff, Bradley J. Luck, Leah T. Handelman. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/17/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by August 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/29/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint for Declaratory Relief served on Christian Salacinski individually and on behalf of Sal Construction, LLC on July 15, 2020, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Handelman, Leah) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stephen E. Woodruff appearing for Defendants Sal Construction LLC, Christian Salacinski Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Woodruff, Stephen) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ACC). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. Woodruff on behalf of All Defendants (Woodruff, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Handelman, Leah) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JDR) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit ROR Letter

1 #2

Exhibit Underlying Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sal Construction LLC, Christian Salacinski, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit ROR Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) Modified on 7/2/2020 to correct filed date (JDR). Modified on 7/2/2020 to correct plaintiff party name(EMH). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. (See order for call-in information) Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/27/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Sal Construction LLC, Christian Salacinski. (Woodruff, Stephen) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE UPON CONSENT TO USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDH) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDH) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Stephen E. Woodruff, Bradley J. Luck, Leah T. Handelman. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/17/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by August 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/29/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint for Declaratory Relief served on Christian Salacinski individually and on behalf of Sal Construction, LLC on July 15, 2020, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Handelman, Leah) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stephen E. Woodruff appearing for Defendants Sal Construction LLC, Christian Salacinski Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Woodruff, Stephen) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ACC). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. Woodruff on behalf of All Defendants (Woodruff, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Handelman, Leah) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number MTX100017257 (JDR) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JDR) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sal Construction LLC, Christian Salacinski, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit ROR Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) Modified on 7/2/2020 to correct filed date (JDR). Modified on 7/2/2020 to correct plaintiff party name(EMH). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less