This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:48:03 (UTC).

Scottsdale Insurance Co v. Martzahn

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Scottsdale Insurance Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Martzahn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Defendant

Dan Martzahn

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas H Peyton

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (NO)

365 Canal St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Madeleine Kate Morgan

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (NO)

365 Canal St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Jay R Sever

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (NO)

365 Canal St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Petition for Appointment of an Umpire against Dan Martzahn (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4967990) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed order, #7 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Thomas H Peyton added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:selreq))(aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Policy

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #6

Proposed order

1 #7

Proposed summons/writ

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dan Martzahn. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Thomas H Peyton on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/7/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Jay R. Sever to Enroll as Counsel by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order )(aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Dan Martzahn served on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jay R Sever for Scottsdale Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/27/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION for Jay R. Sever to Enroll as Counsel. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Jay R. Sever to Enroll as Counsel by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order )(aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Thomas H Peyton on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/7/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dan Martzahn. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition for Appointment of an Umpire against Dan Martzahn (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4967990) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed order, #7 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Thomas H Peyton added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:selreq))(aty,Peyton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cade Richard Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A Juneau, Jr