This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2021 at 15:53:54 (UTC).

Scott v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Scott filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and William J. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01069

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Scott

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dominic Xavier Genco

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Sheryl Lynn Anderson

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Christopher Michael Unger

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Anderson, Sheryl) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#26

(#26) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/7/21. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order

#25

(#25) Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Anderson, Sheryl) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#24

(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/26/2021. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#23

(#23) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, ) Modified on 5/28/2021 to correct date of hearing to 5/26/2021 (bwilk, ). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#22

(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Unger, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#18

(#19) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01069-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

1 #19

Affidavit of Service

1 #17

District Court Civil Summons - State Farm

1 #16

District Court Civil Summons - Stephanie Gillingham

1 #15

Docket Sheet

1 #14

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit L - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit K - Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #10

Exhibit J - Articles of Incorporation

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 2021CV30267. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7822054), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Gillingham, #3 Exhibit C - Order Re Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Gillingham, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Stephanie Gillingham.pdf, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration Pages, #6 Exhibit F - TAR, #7 Exhibit G - MVR, #8 Exhibit H - Voter Registration, #9 Exhibit I - Certificate of Good Standing, #10 Exhibit J - Articles of Incorporation, #11 Exhibit K - Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 Exhibit L - Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Docket Sheet, #16 District Court Civil Summons - Stephanie Gillingham, #17 District Court Civil Summons - State Farm, #18 Delay Reduction Order, #19 Affidavit of Service, #20 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, #21 Waiver of Service - Stephanie Gillingham, #22 Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, #23 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a), #24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a), #25 Stephanie Gillingham's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.CP. 8(a), #26 Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P, #27 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #28 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #29 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for One-Week Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a))(Anderson, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MEMORANDUM regarding #27 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/14/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Anderson, Sheryl) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/7/21. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Anderson, Sheryl) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/26/2021. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, ) Modified on 5/28/2021 to correct date of hearing to 5/26/2021 (bwilk, ). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Unger, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5 /17/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/17/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01069-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#10) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Claim Against Stephanie Gillingham with Prejudice by Denver County District Court Judge J. Eric Elliff on 04/13/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for One-Week Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a) To and Including April 19, 2021 by Denver County District Court Judge J. Eric Elliff on 4/13/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dimiss [sic] Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P 8(a) by Denver County District Court Judge J. Eric Ellif pm 03/25/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Denver County District Court Judge J. Eric Elliff on 02/11/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 01/28/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Justin Scott.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 2021CV30267. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7822054), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Gillingham, #3 Exhibit C - Order Re Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Gillingham, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Stephanie Gillingham.pdf, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration Pages, #6 Exhibit F - TAR, #7 Exhibit G - MVR, #8 Exhibit H - Voter Registration, #9 Exhibit I - Certificate of Good Standing, #10 Exhibit J - Articles of Incorporation, #11 Exhibit K - Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 Exhibit L - Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Docket Sheet, #16 District Court Civil Summons - Stephanie Gillingham, #17 District Court Civil Summons - State Farm, #18 Delay Reduction Order, #19 Affidavit of Service, #20 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, #21 Waiver of Service - Stephanie Gillingham, #22 Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, #23 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a), #24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a), #25 Stephanie Gillingham's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.CP. 8(a), #26 Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P, #27 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #28 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #29 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for One-Week Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Claims Two and Three Under C.R.C.P. 12(b)(5) and C.R.C.P. 8(a))(Anderson, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dominic Xavier Genco