This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 09:07:33 (UTC).

SCOTT v. ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 SCOTT filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01105

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREVOR SCOTT

Defendants

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.

COMCAST CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL GROH

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

PATRICK G. BRADY

Attorney at EPSTEIN BEKER & GREEN, P.C.

One Gateway Center, 13Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ASHLEY BAXTER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

10 Sentry Pkwy Sutie 200, Pobox 3001

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of TREVOR SCOTT with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TREVOR SCOTT. COMCAST CORPORATION waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TREVOR SCOTT. ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Certificate of Service

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK G. BRADY on behalf of ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. (BRADY, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK G. BRADY on behalf of ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. (BRADY, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA on behalf of COMCAST CORPORATION with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY BAXTER on behalf of COMCAST CORPORATION with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BAXTER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TREVOR SCOTT. ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TREVOR SCOTT. COMCAST CORPORATION waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of TREVOR SCOTT with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to COMCAST CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.. E-mailed to Michael Groh, Esq. on 3/22/22. (fdc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COMCAST CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15806143.), filed by TREVOR SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA ROBERT HALF FINANCE & ACCOUNTING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK G. BRADY(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Puma