This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:27:57 (UTC).

Scott v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Scott filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Jane Triche Milazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13699

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delphina Scott

Defendants

Burger King Corporation

3838 North Causeway Boulevard, Suite 2900, 3838 North Causeway Boulevard, Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

ABC Insurance Company

Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.

3838 North Causeway Boulevard, Suite 2900, 3838 North Causeway Boulevard, Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kurt A. Offner

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Cristen Freeman Marcotte

Attorney at The Law Firm of Cristen Freeman, LLC

2924 Metairie Heights Ave.

Metairie, LA 70002

Roderick Alvendia

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Jeanne K. Demarest

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Lair

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christian B. Bogart

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Status Conference set for 4/9/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. All discovery must be completed by 8/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ecm) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. The Court will initiate the telephone conference call.(ecm) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Burger King Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International, Inc. for Burger King Corporation (Lair, Andrew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International, Inc. for Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. (Lair, Andrew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Proof of Service

1 #3

Verification

1 #2

Certificate of Notice to Adverse Party

1 #1

Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447b

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-9161 C(10) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CLAEDC-7979655) filed by Burger King Corporation, Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447b, #2 Certificate of Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Verification, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Andrew J. Lair added to party Burger King Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew J. Lair added to party Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lair, Andrew) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (am). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Status Conference set for 4/9/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. All discovery must be completed by 8/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ecm) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. The Court will initiate the telephone conference call.(ecm) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Burger King Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International, Inc. for Burger King Corporation (Lair, Andrew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International, Inc. for Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. (Lair, Andrew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-9161 C(10) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CLAEDC-7979655) filed by Burger King Corporation, Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447b, #2 Certificate of Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Verification, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Andrew J. Lair added to party Burger King Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew J. Lair added to party Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lair, Andrew) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (am). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.