This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 09:56:08 (UTC).

Scott v. Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Scott filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pat Salmon Sons, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00590

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Scott

Defendants

Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.

Carl Wilson

Trisal Leasing Company, Inc.

John Doe Person A-M

John Doe Entities N-Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay Max Kilpatrick

Attorney at KOBS & PHILLEY, PLLC

P.O. Box 2230

Madison, MS 39130

Defendant Attorney

Todd B. Murrah

Attorney at GLASSMAN, WYATT, TUTTLE & COX, PC

26 North Second St.

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Trisal Leasing Company, Inc..(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Scott. (Kilpatrick, Jay) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Scott. Trisal Leasing Company, Inc. served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Kilpatrick, Jay) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. (Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc..(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd B. Murrah on behalf of Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Trisal Leasing Company, Inc. (Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Scott. Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Kilpatrick, Jay) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Trisal Leasing Company, Inc., Carl Wilson. (LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John Doe Entities N-Z, John Doe Person A-M, Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Trisal Leasing Company, Inc., Carl Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643060687), filed by Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Trisal Leasing Company, Inc..(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Scott. (Kilpatrick, Jay) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 . A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (ND) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Scott. Trisal Leasing Company, Inc. served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Kilpatrick, Jay) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. (Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc..(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd B. Murrah on behalf of Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Trisal Leasing Company, Inc. (Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Scott. Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Kilpatrick, Jay) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Trisal Leasing Company, Inc., Carl Wilson. (LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John Doe Entities N-Z, John Doe Person A-M, Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Trisal Leasing Company, Inc., Carl Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643060687), filed by Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less