Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:41:50 (UTC).

Scott v. MCI Communications Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Scott filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCI Communications Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark D. Clarke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01626

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark D. Clarke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua M Scott

Defendant

MCI Communications Services, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Verizon Business Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rachele R. Selvig

Attorney at Cauble, Selvig & Whittington, LLP

111 Se 6Th St.

Grants Pass, OR 97526

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Selvig, Rachele) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to MCI Communications Services, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7252649 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Joshua M Scott against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cauble, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Selvig, Rachele) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 1/19/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to MCI Communications Services, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 1/5/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7252649 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Joshua M Scott against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cauble, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachele R. Selvig