This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 07:24:43 (UTC).

Scott v. Golden State FC, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Scott filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Golden State FC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02147

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lovenia Scott

Defendants

Golden State FC, LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Amazon.com Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard,Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine V.A. Smith

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Megan M. Cooney

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#12

#10

8 #2

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay

8 #1

Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith in Support of Motion to Stay

#8

#5

#3

#2

1 #5

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declaration of Zane Brown

1 #2

Declaration of Denicia "JP" Prather

1 #1

Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEFENDANTS GOLDEN STATE FC, LLC (NOW KNOWN AS AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC) AND AMAZON.COM, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY ACTION (re #8 MOTION to Stay ) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/26/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Incorrect Event Used. The correct event is Re-notice Motion. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Motions and Relate d Filings > Other Supporting Documents. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #14 Notice (Other) filed by Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Stay ) filed byLovenia Scott. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 4/16/2021) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action With the Superior Court by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearing as to #8 MOTION to Stay , See Docket No. #14 : Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS GOLDEN STATE FC, LLC (NOW KNOWN AS AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC) AND AMAZON.COM, INC.S MOTION TO STAY ACTION by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC re #8 MOTION to Stay (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 29, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by June 22nd. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-02147-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 4/6/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lovenia Scott.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Stay filed byAmazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 4/16/2021. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Case does not involve patents. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #3 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent filed by Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/12/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Related Actions by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (wsnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Golden State FC, LLC. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Class Action from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-589695. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-15759184). Filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith, #2 Declaration of Denicia "JP" Prather, #3 Declaration of Zane Brown, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden State FC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farrah Grant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Alistair Segal