This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2019 at 07:59:50 (UTC).

Scott v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Scott filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lord Vincent Scott

Defendant

Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christian L. Torp

P.O. Box 861

Lexington, KY 40588

Defendant Attorney

Laurel K. Cornell

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips - Louisville

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1700

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, inc.; 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is not just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/13/2019.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc's #4 MOTION for summary judgment is GRANTED and its motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot; 2. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. with respect to the claim presented in this civil action; 3. Plaintiff Scott's KCRA claim for wrongful discharge is DISMISSED with prejudice; 4. This action will be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/13/2019.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 11/13/2019)

4 #5

Proposed Order

4 #4

Exhibit B - Notice of Determination

4 #3

Exhibit 1 to Exh. A - Employee Separation Form

4 #2

Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew Endlish

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew Endlish, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exh. A - Employee Separation Form, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Determination, #5 Proposed Order)(Cornell, Laurel) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (JJ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-3300. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4483634), filed by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, inc.; 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is not just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/13/2019.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc's #4 MOTION for summary judgment is GRANTED and its motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot; 2. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. with respect to the claim presented in this civil action; 3. Plaintiff Scott's KCRA claim for wrongful discharge is DISMISSED with prejudice; 4. This action will be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/13/2019.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (JLM) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew Endlish, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exh. A - Employee Separation Form, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Determination, #5 Proposed Order)(Cornell, Laurel) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (JJ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (JJ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-3300. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4483634), filed by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurel K. Cornell