This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 09:24:37 (UTC).

Scott v. F.B.I et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Scott filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against F B I. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Saporito, Jr and Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01057

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William J. Scott

Mount Carmel, PA 17851

Defendants

N.S.A

F.B.I

D.O.J

C.I.A

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #7 Magistrate Judge Saporito's Report and Recommendation is adopted; the action is dismissed as legally and factually frivolous; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/12/2021. (Case closed.) (lg) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by William J. Scott. We recommend that this action be dismissed as legally and factually frivolous, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and that the Clerk be directed to mark this case as closed. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/15/21. (ms) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. Service of the complaint held in abeyance pending screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/15/21 (ms) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM for dft FBI only to be attached to when served by USM submitted by Plaintiff. (lg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

4 #1

285 Service Packet with IFP Notice

#4

(#4) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

3 #2

Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules

3 #1

Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint

#3

(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint, #2 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules) (nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William J. Scott.(nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against C.I.A, D.O.J, F.B.I, N.S.A lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by William J. Scott.(nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #7 Magistrate Judge Saporito's Report and Recommendation is adopted; the action is dismissed as legally and factually frivolous; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/12/2021. (Case closed.) (lg) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by William J. Scott. We recommend that this action be dismissed as legally and factually frivolous, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and that the Clerk be directed to mark this case as closed. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/15/21. (ms) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. Service of the complaint held in abeyance pending screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/15/21 (ms) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Matthew W. Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM for dft FBI only to be attached to when served by USM submitted by Plaintiff. (lg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint, #2 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules) (nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William J. Scott.(nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against C.I.A, D.O.J, F.B.I, N.S.A lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by William J. Scott.(nr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NSA is a litigant

Latest cases where CIA is a litigant

Latest cases where FBI is a litigant

Latest cases where DOJ is a litigant