This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 07:36:35 (UTC).

Scott v. Dugan

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Scott filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dugan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisette M. Reid and K. Michael Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-10200

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

Presiding Judge

K. Michael Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Scott

Key West, FL 33040

Defendant

State Attorney Kelly Dugan

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Scott. (lk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Rejection of Service of Process. (cds) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

5 #1

IFP Form

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before December 19, 2019, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00. Responses due by 12/19/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Scott. (pes) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Kelly Dugan. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Scott.(pes) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Scott. (lk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Filing Rejection of Service of Process. (cds) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before December 19, 2019, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00. Responses due by 12/19/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Scott. (pes) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Kelly Dugan. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Scott.(pes) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less