This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 18:37:44 (UTC).

Scott v. Complete Logistical Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Scott filed an Other lawsuit against Complete Logistical Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan J. Baverman and Charles A. Pannell, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MI-00043

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josef Scott

Petitioners

Georgia Department of Human Services

Georgia Division of Child Support Services

Defendants

Complete Logistical Services, LLC

Noble Drilling (U.S.), LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Arlen Braud, II

Attorney at Braud Gallagher, LLC

Suite 201, 111 N. Causeway Boulevard

Mandeville, LA 70448

Michelle O. Gallagher

Attorney at Braud Gallagher, LLC

Suite 201, 111 N. Causeway Boulevard

Mandeville, LA 70448

Steven Dewayne Jackson

Attorney at Braud Gallagher, LLC

Suite 201, 111 N. Causeway Boulevard

Mandeville, LA 70448

Petitioner Attorneys

Shalen S Nelson

Attorney at Department of Law - Division 5

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Jason S. Naunas

Attorney at Department of Law - Division 5

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Defendant Attorneys

Brady M. Hadden

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, PLC

Suite 5000, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Brett D. Wise

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, PLC

Suite 5000, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

David L. Reisman

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, PLC

Suite 5000, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/1/2021. (adg) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brady M. Hadden. Clerk to follow-up by 6/28/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#6

(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brett D. Wise. Clerk to follow-up by 6/28/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David L. Reisman. Clerk to follow-up by 6/28/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#4

(#4) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Charles Arlen Braud, II. Clerk to follow-up by 6/25/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven Dewayne Jackson. Clerk to follow-up by 6/25/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michelle O. Gallagher. Clerk to follow-up by 6/25/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Subpoena

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoenaby Georgia Department of Human Services, Georgia Division of Child Support Services. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Subpoena, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Case Terminated. (adg) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/1/2021. (adg) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (adg) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brady M. Hadden. Clerk to follow-up by 6/28/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brett D. Wise. Clerk to follow-up by 6/28/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David L. Reisman. Clerk to follow-up by 6/28/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Charles Arlen Braud, II. Clerk to follow-up by 6/25/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven Dewayne Jackson. Clerk to follow-up by 6/25/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michelle O. Gallagher. Clerk to follow-up by 6/25/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoenaby Georgia Department of Human Services, Georgia Division of Child Support Services. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Subpoena, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Complete Logistical Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NOBLE DRILLING CORPORATION (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY AND is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, EX REL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Samuel Naunas