This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2022 at 07:31:51 (UTC).

Scott v. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Scott filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A. Jackson and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00488

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timika Scott

Defendants

City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge

CorrectHealth, East Baton Rouge, LLC

CorrectHealth, LLC

Nova Casualty Company

Ironshore, A Liberty Mutual Company

Sid Gautreaux

Dennis Grimes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Murell

Ronald S. Haley, Jr.

William R. Claiborne

David J. Utter

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timika Scott. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge waiver sent on 8/29/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Utter, David) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

10 #3

Exhibit B- Declaration of and Oath of William R.Claiborne

10 #2

Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2468602) by Timika Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of and Oath of William R.Claiborne)(Utter, David) Modified on 8/25/2022 to remove duplicate text (JEG). (Entered: 08/24/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Enroll Ronald Haley as Additional Attorney by Timika Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timika Scott. Dennis Grimes waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Utter, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timika Scott. Sid Gautreaux waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Utter, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Timika Scott (Utter, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/20/2022) (ELW). (Entered: 07/19/2022)

1 #8

Summons Ironshore

1 #7

Summons Nova

1 #6

Summons CORRECTHEALTH, LLC

1 #3

Summons Sheriff Sid Gautreaux

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2452364.), filed by Timika Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Baton Rouge_Parish of East Baton Rouge, #3 Summons Sheriff Sid Gautreaux, #4 Summons Warden Dennis Grimes, #5 Summons CORRECTHEALTH, EAST BATON ROUGE LLC, #6 Summons CORRECTHEALTH, LLC, #7 Summons Nova, #8 Summons Ironshore)(Utter, David) (Attachment 1 through 8 replaced on 7/20/2022) (ELW) Modified on 7/20/2022 to flatten document (ELW). (Entered: 07/19/2022)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel: In light of the #12 Waiver of Service filed, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/1/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timika Scott. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge waiver sent on 8/29/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Utter, David) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/25/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2468602). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2468602) by Timika Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of and Oath of William R.Claiborne)(Utter, David) Modified on 8/25/2022 to remove duplicate text (JEG). (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Ronald S. Haley, Jr. for Timika Scott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/17/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Enroll Ronald Haley as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Enroll Ronald Haley as Additional Attorney by Timika Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel: In light of the #5 and #6 Waivers of Service filed, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/27/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timika Scott. Dennis Grimes waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Utter, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timika Scott. Sid Gautreaux waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Utter, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Timika Scott (Utter, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/20/2022) (ELW). (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2452364.), filed by Timika Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Baton Rouge_Parish of East Baton Rouge, #3 Summons Sheriff Sid Gautreaux, #4 Summons Warden Dennis Grimes, #5 Summons CORRECTHEALTH, EAST BATON ROUGE LLC, #6 Summons CORRECTHEALTH, LLC, #7 Summons Nova, #8 Summons Ironshore)(Utter, David) (Attachment 1 through 8 replaced on 7/20/2022) (ELW) Modified on 7/20/2022 to flatten document (ELW). (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less