This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2021 at 09:49:01 (UTC).

Scott v. Arkansas Division of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Scott filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Arkansas Division of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joe J. Volpe and Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joe J. Volpe

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deverick Scott

Grady, AR 71644-0600

Defendants

Dexter Payne

Mahoney

Marshall Reed

Does "Joshua" Sergeant, VSM Unit; "Officers" Varner Unit

T Dunlap

Compton

Grandy

Carroll

Shipman

Rory Griffin

Varner Super Max

Bland

Carolyn Wallace

Hargrave

Washington

Arkansas Division of Corrections

Rosalyn Williams

Cook

Gibson

14 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #1 IFP Application; and directing Plaintiff to submit to the Clerk of this Court the statutory filing fee of $402, in full, within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/3/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Deverick Scott. (llg) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to extend time and for TRO #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/25/2021. (lej) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time and Motion of Restraining Order/Injunction Relief by Deverick Scott. (kdr) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER holding #1 IFP Application in abeyance; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form with a copy of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this Order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/4/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Deverick Scott. (llg) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deverick Scott. (llg) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less