This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:48:44 (UTC).

Scott v. Allegan, County of et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Scott filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Allegan, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Scott

Defendants

County of Allegan

Blaie Kacos #609

Allegan, County of

Blaie Kacos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Trainor

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Amy J. DeRouin

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew James Brege

Attorney at Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, PC (Lansing)

822 Centennial Way, Ste. 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Thomas David Beindit

Attorney at Garan Lucow Miller PC (Detroit)

1000 Woodbridge St.

Detroit, MI 48207

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos for Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Danielle Scott for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Danielle Scott re #17 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #16 by Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: early settlement conference set for 10/15/2019 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

11 #1

Exhibit A-Proposed First Amended Complaint

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Danielle Scott re #7 [Attorney Amy J. DeRouin added to party Danielle Scott(pty:pla)] (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/23/2019 at 11:30 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 5/16/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#7

(#9) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Danielle Scott re #7 [Attorney Amy J. DeRouin added to party Danielle Scott(pty:pla)] (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Blaie Kacos served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Allegan, County of served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos (clw) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos for Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Danielle Scott for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #19 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #19 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Protective Order by defendants Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Danielle Scott re #17 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #16 by Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Danielle Scott (pjw) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Danielle Scott for Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants and Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to All Defendants (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: early settlement conference set for 10/15/2019 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Danielle Scott re #7 [Attorney Amy J. DeRouin added to party Danielle Scott(pty:pla)] (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/23/2019 at 11:30 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 5/16/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos (Brege, Andrew) Modified text on 4/26/2019 (clw). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Blaie Kacos served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Allegan, County of served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos (clw) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Danielle Scott in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4390134 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allegan, County of, Blaie Kacos filed by Danielle Scott (Trainor, Christopher) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less