This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2022 at 08:44:33 (UTC).

Scott v. 84 Lumber Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Scott filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 84 Lumber Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00613

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter R. Scott

Defendants

Cameron International Corporation

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC

ViacomCBS Inc.

Warren Pumps, LLC

ZF Active Safety US Inc.

84 Lumber Company

Ace Hardware Corporation

Air & Liquid System Corporation

Alfa Laval Inc.

Amcord, Inc.

American Biltrite, Inc.

Armstrong International, Inc.

Arvinmeritor, Inc.

Atwood & Morrill

Aurora Pump Company

Blackmer Pump Company

Bryan Steam LLC

BW/IP Inc.

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin R. Schmickle

Attorney at SWMW Law, LLC

701 Market Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63101

Steven M. Aroesty

Attorney at SWMW Law, LLC

701 Market Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant Attorneys

Robert William Stephens

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP-St. Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 2100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Earl B. Thames, Jr.

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - St. Louis

211 North Broadway, Suite 2150

St. Louis, MO 63102

L. Bryan Hopkins

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Other Attorneys

Undray Wilks

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP - Chicago

110 North Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP - St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Anna Gonis O'Connor

Attorney at Sinars Slowikowski Tomaska LLC

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60603

Holly Ann Rogers

Attorney at Hawkins, Parnell et al. - St. Louis

10 South Broadway, Suite 1300

St. Louis, MO 63102-1708

Candace Ann Weatherfield

Attorney at Hawkins, Parnell et al. - St. Louis

10 South Broadway, Suite 1300

St. Louis, MO 63102-1708

 

Court Documents

#90

(#90) Letter to Clerk, St. Clair County Circuit Court attaching certified copy of the Remand Order at Doc. 89. (kls3) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#89

(#89) ORDER OF REMAND: This case is remanded to the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2022. (mah) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#88

(#88) MEMORANDUM in Support re #87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#87

(#87) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#86

(#86) MEMORANDUM in Support re #85 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#85

(#85) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#84

(#84) MEMORANDUM in Support re #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Hercules, LLC. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#83

(#83) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Hercules, LLC. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#82

(#82) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Krogh Pump Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Krogh Pump Company, Inc. for Krogh Pump Company, Inc.. (O'Connor, Anna) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#6

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Errata B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Letter to Clerk, St. Clair County Circuit Court attaching certified copy of the Remand Order at Doc. 89. (kls3) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ORDER OF REMAND: This case is remanded to the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2022. (mah) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MEMORANDUM in Support re #87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) MEMORANDUM in Support re #85 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MEMORANDUM in Support re #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Hercules, LLC. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Hercules, LLC. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Krogh Pump Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Krogh Pump Company, Inc. for Krogh Pump Company, Inc.. (O'Connor, Anna) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Gonis O'Connor on behalf of Dap, Inc. (O'Connor, Anna) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Laval Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval Inc.. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-613-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, IL, case number 22LA0123 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4743174), filed by Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bryan Steam LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Alfa Laval Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARVINMERITOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ATWOOD & MORRILL is a litigant