This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:52:59 (UTC).

Scott et al v. RVSHARE LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Scott filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against RVSHARE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alistair Newbern and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leslie Scott

Tal Becker

Defendant

RVSHARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James C. Bradshaw, III

Cam F. Justice

Adam D. Breit

Defendant Attorneys

Alice Haston

Daniel H. Bryan

Michael G. Abelow

Patrick J. Krebs

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

23 #7

Exhibit G: September 18, 2020 Terms

23 #6

Exhibit F: Plaintiff Becker's reservation details

23 #4

Exhibit D: Plaintiff Scott's reservation details

#22

#19

#18

#7

6 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Cam J. Justice

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) SUMMONS returned executed by Leslie Scott and Tal Becker. RVSHARE LLC served on 7/9/2021. (kc) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) ORDER: The motion #19 is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CANCELLED. Plaintiffs shall move to reset the initial case management conference no later than 7 days after the motion to compel arbitration is decided, if the case remains active in this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) DECLARATION of Thomas Klenotic filed by RVSHARE LLC re: #22 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Begin your Booking, #2 Exhibit B: Confirm and Pay, #3 Exhibit C: Acceptance of Terms by Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit D: Plaintiff Scott's reservation details, #5 Exhibit E: June 9, 2020 Terms, #6 Exhibit F: Plaintiff Becker's reservation details, #7 Exhibit G: September 18, 2020 Terms)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Individual Arbitration filed by RVSHARE LLC . (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Individual Arbitration by RVSHARE LLC. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RVSHARE LLC. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference pending ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration by RVSHARE LLC. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer pending ruling on motion to compel arbitration by RVSHARE LLC. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 and #16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Patrick J. Krebs and Daniel H. Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/21/2021. (lh) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Adam D. Breit to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3376173) by Tal Becker, Leslie Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Adam D. Breit)(Bradshaw, James) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Cam J. Justice to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3376157) by Tal Becker, Leslie Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Cam J. Justice)(Bradshaw, James) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons issued as to RVSHARE LLC. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 7/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021

DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Cam F. Justice: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/9/2021. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021

DocketFL State Bar status verified as active for Cam F. Justice not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) Modified on 5/19/2021 (kc). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021

DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for James C. Bradshaw, III admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against RVSHARE LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503374537), filed by Leslie Scott, Tal Becker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less