Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2021 at 09:26:29 (UTC).

Scott et al v. Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Scott filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and ScottD. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Corey Scott

Rashad Williams

Steven Williams

Corey D. Scott

Moneika Houston

Defendant

Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R Bullman

Attorney at The Bullman Law Firm, LLC

201 Saint Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Brian Francis Blackwell

Attorney at Blackwell & Bullman, LLC

8322 One Calais Avenue

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorney

Susan Fahey Desmond

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC (Desmond, Susan) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC.(Desmond, Susan) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

11 #2

Proposed Pleading;

11 #1

Attachment

#11

(#11) MOTION for Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bullman, James) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Amended Complaint by Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Desmond, Susan) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/15/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Williams, Moneika Houston, Rashad Williams, Corey D. Scott. Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Bullman, James) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Sue--Moneika Houston by Corey D. Scott, Rashad Williams, Steven Williams (Bullman, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION for Conditional Certification of Class Claims Under 216(B) of the FLSA by Corey Scott, Rashad Williams, Steven Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Bullman, James) Modified on 12/10/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

2 #3

Attachment

2 #2

Attachment

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC, filed by Steven Williams, Rashad Williams, Corey Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Bullman, James) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Status Conference is GRANTED. A telephone Status Conference is set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before United States Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. The parties should be prepared to discuss the matters raised in Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference (R. Doc. 11), including the recent Fifth Circuit opinion, Swales v. KLLM Transport Services, LLC, -- F.3d --, 2021 WL 98229 (5th Cir. 2021). Counsel participating in the Conference shall call using the AT&T Teleconference System five minutes prior to the conference. Counsel will receive a separate e-mail containing dial in information prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC (Desmond, Susan) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC.(Desmond, Susan) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Status Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bullman, James) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Because the conditions of Local Rule 7(a) are met, Defendant's #9 Motion for Extension is GRANTED and Defendant has an additional 21 days to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/4/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Amended Complaint by Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Desmond, Susan) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/15/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Williams, Moneika Houston, Rashad Williams, Corey D. Scott. Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Bullman, James) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Sue--Moneika Houston by Corey D. Scott, Rashad Williams, Steven Williams (Bullman, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Conditional Certification of Class Claims Under 216(B) of the FLSA by Corey Scott, Rashad Williams, Steven Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Bullman, James) Modified on 12/10/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mobilelink Louisiana, LLC, filed by Steven Williams, Rashad Williams, Corey Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Bullman, James) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT- FLSA Collective Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2218620.), filed by Steven Williams, Rashad Williams, Corey Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Bullman, James) Modified on 12/10/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan Fahey Desmond