This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2021 at 09:49:02 (UTC).

Scott Dellinger v. Atkins North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Scott Dellinger filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Atkins North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03421

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT DELLINGER

Defendants

ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC.

MIKE NEWTON

DOES 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sergio Bent

Attorney at Bent Caryl and Kroll LLP

6300 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1415

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Steven M. Kroll

Attorney at Bent Caryl and Kroll LLP

6300 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1415

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorneys

Hyun Bok Lee

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5793

Eric W May

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jamie C. Pollaci

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3021

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc... (May, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric W May counsel for Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Attorney Eric W May added to party Atkins North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(May, Eric) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hyun Bok Lee counsel for Defendants Atkins North America, Inc., Mike Newton. Hyun Bok Lee is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Atkins North America, Inc. and Mike Newton. (Attorney Hyun Bok Lee added to party Mike Newton(pty:dft))(Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on April 21, 2021. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying WS Atkins, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC., identifying Atkins North America Holdings Corporation; WS Atkins, Inc.. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc... (May, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric W May counsel for Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Attorney Eric W May added to party Atkins North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(May, Eric) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hyun Bok Lee counsel for Defendants Atkins North America, Inc., Mike Newton. Hyun Bok Lee is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Atkins North America, Inc. and Mike Newton. (Attorney Hyun Bok Lee added to party Mike Newton(pty:dft))(Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint Filed by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/19/2021, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Scott Dellinger in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/29/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on April 21, 2021. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying WS Atkins, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC., identifying Atkins North America Holdings Corporation; WS Atkins, Inc.. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV03605 Receipt No: ACACDC-31160683 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration OF HYUN LEE, #5 Declaration OF MIKE NEWTON, #6 PROOF OF SERVICE) (Attorney Hyun Bok Lee added to party ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC.(pty:dft))(Lee, Hyun Bok) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atkins North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sergio Bent