This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2020 at 08:50:46 (UTC).

Scott Craven DDS PC et al v. Cameron Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Scott Craven DDS PC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00715

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Met Building LLC

Scott Craven DDS PC

Defendant

Cameron Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Kent Emison

Attorney at Langdon & Emison

911 Main Street, P.O. Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

Christopher Curtis Shank

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KCMO

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Patrick J. Stueve

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KCMO

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Richard F. Lombardo

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

John J. Schirger

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main St., Ste. 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

Abby McClellan

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KCMO

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Bradley Wilders

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KCMO

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Matthew W. Lytle

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main St., Ste. 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

Joseph M Feierabend

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main St., Ste. 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

Cassandra R. Wait

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner, LLP - KCMO

1200 Main Street, Suite 3800

Kansas City, MO 64105

Robert J Hoffman

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1200 Main Street, Suite 3500

Kansas City, MO 64105

Robert M. Thompson

Attorney at Bryan Cave, LLP

1200 Main Street, Suite 3800

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

26 #3

Exhibit 3

26 #2

Exhibit 2

26 #1

Exhibit 1

#26

#25

24 #3

Exhibit C

24 #2

Exhibit B

24 #1

Exhibit A

#14

5 #1

MAP General Order

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert J Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Hoffman, Robert) Modified on 10/28/2020 to correct docket text (Houston, Kiambu). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Patrick J. Stueve on behalf of Plaintiffs Met Building LLC, Scott Craven DDS PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patrick J. Stueve on behalf of Plaintiffs Met Building LLC, Scott Craven DDS PC. Reply suggestions due by 10/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendant's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal, Doc. #22 , is granted. Defendant has leave to file Exhibits 1 and 2 specified in its suggestions in opposition, Doc. 21, under seal. Signed on October 2, 2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Opalach, Tessa) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for leave to file Exhibits Under Seal filed by Robert J Hoffman on behalf of Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Robert J Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 10/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ENTRY. Teleconference held before the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey on October 2, 2020 regarding Plaintiffs' motion to stay briefing on Defendant's motion to dismiss, Doc. 18. Statements presented by the parties. The Court denied the motion. Appearances: Plaintiff by Patrick Stueve, Bradley Wilders, Christopher Shank, and J. Kent Emison. Defendant by Robert Hoffman, Robert Thompson, and J. Potts. Court Reporter: None. Courtroom Deputy: Renea Matthes Mitra. (Text entry only.) This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/2/2020 at 10:00 AM regarding the motion to stay briefing, doc. 18. The parties shall call conference number 877-336-1828, access code: 8503666 to participate. Signed on 10/1/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to stay Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Patrick J. Stueve on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' proposed scheduling order is due on September 30, 2020. Doc. 4. The parties seek an extension of the deadline until 14 days after the Court rules Plaintiff's motion to remand or Defendant's motion to dismiss, whichever is later. Doc. #13 . The parties' joint motion to continue the deadline for filing of proposed scheduling order, Doc. #13 , is granted in part. The parties must submit a proposed scheduling order within 14 days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed on September 30, 2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Opalach, Tessa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Patrick J. Stueve on behalf of Plaintiffs Met Building LLC, Scott Craven DDS PC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to remand filed by Patrick J. Stueve on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert J Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Cameron Mutual Insurance Company.(Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, Doc. #6 , is granted. Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed on or before September 29, 2020. Signed on September 11, 2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Opalach, Tessa) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Robert J Hoffman on behalf of Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP reassignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 9/30/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 9/23/2020. Signed on 9/9/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 9/9/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri County, case number 20CY-CV06381, filed by Robert J Hoffman on behalf of Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7033391. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby McClellan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Curtis Shank

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard F. Lombardo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Feierabend