This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 09:20:22 (UTC).

Scioto Water Inc v. City of Portsmouth

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Scioto Water Inc filed an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit against City of Portsmouth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00817

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scioto Water Inc

Defendant

City of Portsmouth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew A Dooley

Attorney at O'Toole, McLaughlin, Dooley & Pecora, Co. LPA

5455 Detroit Rd

Sheffield Village, OH 44054

Stephen M. Bosak, Jr.

5455 Detroit Road

Sheffield Village, OH 44054

Defendant Attorney

Scott A Sollmann

Attorney at Schroeder, Maundrell, Barbiere & Powers

5300 Socialville-Foster Road, Suite 200

Mason, OH 45040

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by City of Portsmouth. (Sollmann, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to City of Portsmouth on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Dooley, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to City of Portsmouth. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND (verified) for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against City of Portsmouth ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7711979), filed by Scioto Water Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Dooley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by City of Portsmouth. (Sollmann, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to City of Portsmouth on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Dooley, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to City of Portsmouth. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND (verified) for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against City of Portsmouth ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7711979), filed by Scioto Water Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Dooley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Sollmann