Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 16:01:27 (UTC).

Schwendimann et al v. Stahls', Inc.,

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Schwendimann filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Stahls', Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Linda V. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10525

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jodi A Schwendimann

NuCoat, Inc.

Defendant

Stahls', Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J. Lund

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

4000 Town Center, 18Th Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Devan V. Padmanabhan

Attorney at Padmanabhan and Dawson, PLLC

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Michelle E. Dawson

Attorney at Padmanabhan and Dawson, PLLC

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Britta Schnoor Loftus

Attorney at Padmanabhan and Dawson, PLLC

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

Glenn E. Forbis

Attorney at Harness, Dickey & Pierce

5445 Corporate Drive, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stahls', Inc., (Forbis, Glenn) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Britta Schnoor Loftus appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Loftus, Britta) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle E. Dawson appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Dawson, Michelle) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Devan V. Padmanabhan appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 4/15/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn E. Forbis on behalf of Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stahls', Inc., served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Patent Report Sent To Washington (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Stahls', Inc.,* (SOso) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NuCoat, Inc. (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jodi A Schwendimann, NuCoat, Inc. against Stahls', Inc., with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7118474 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Hennepin - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stahls', Inc., (Forbis, Glenn) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Britta Schnoor Loftus appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Loftus, Britta) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle E. Dawson appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Dawson, Michelle) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Devan V. Padmanabhan appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 4/15/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn E. Forbis on behalf of Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stahls', Inc., served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Patent Report Sent To Washington (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • NOTICE of Error directed to: Matthew J. Lund. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Stahls', Inc.,* (SOso) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NuCoat, Inc. (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jodi A Schwendimann, NuCoat, Inc. against Stahls', Inc., with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7118474 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Hennepin - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Lund, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NuCoat, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc. Stahls' is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn E. Forbes