This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 07:16:45 (UTC).

SCHWEIKERT v. THOMAS EAGLE et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 SCHWEIKERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMAS EAGLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04310

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIN SCHWEIKERT

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-10

THOMAS EAGLE

URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN E. QUINN

Attorney at QUINN LAW GROUP LLC

1500 Market St, Centre Square West Suite 4000

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

KRISTIE M. ABEL

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT THE PREVIOUS ORDER #8 IS VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/24/20 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by THOMAS EAGLE, URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC..(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 55 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (THIS ORDER IS VACATED PURSUANT TO JUDGE GOLDBERG'S ORDER OF 10/19/20 #10 ) Modified on 10/19/20 (fdc). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon URS Federal Services, Inc. by Certified Mail on 09/08/2020 (QUINN, SEAN) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC..(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Consent for Removal (ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

3 #3

Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS EAGLE (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14539364), filed by THOMAS EAGLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Designation Form, #10 Case Management Track Form) (lvj, ). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT THE PREVIOUS ORDER #8 IS VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/24/20 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by THOMAS EAGLE, URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC..(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 55 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (THIS ORDER IS VACATED PURSUANT TO JUDGE GOLDBERG'S ORDER OF 10/19/20 #10 ) Modified on 10/19/20 (fdc). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon URS Federal Services, Inc. by Certified Mail on 09/08/2020 (QUINN, SEAN) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#6) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC..(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Consent for Removal (ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS EAGLE (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14539364), filed by THOMAS EAGLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(ABEL, KRISTIE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Designation Form, #10 Case Management Track Form) (lvj, ). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS Federal Services is a litigant