This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:33:04 (UTC).

Schwarz v. Sonoco Products Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Schwarz filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Sonoco Products Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald C Coggins, Jr and Kaymani D West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03447

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

Referral Judge

Kaymani D West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Brandon A Schwarz

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Charlie Schmitt

Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center

Edwin B Pate

Bryan Michael Sansbury

Martha Libby Schmitt

Hartsville Police Department

Sonoco Products Company

Josh Hatchell

J Michaels Grill and Raw Bar LLC

Martha Libby Schmitt d/b/a J. Michaels Restaurant

Hartsville, LLC d/b/a Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center

City of Hartsville

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Shannon Polvi

Attorney at J Lewis Cromer and Associates

Po Box 11675

Columbia, SC 29211

Elizabeth Salley Millender

Attorney at Cromer Babb Porter and Hicks

Po Box 11675

Columbia, SC 29211-1675

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

James Alexander Stanton, IV

Attorney at Stanton and Jones

Po Drawer 70

Hartsville, SC 29550

David Leon Morrison

Attorney at Morrison Law Firm

7453 Irmo Drive, Suite B

Columbia, SC 29212

Connor Evan Johnson

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

111 Coleman Boulevard, Suite 301

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Derek Michael Newberry

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

111 Coleman Boulevard, Suite 301

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Mary Cothonneau Eldridge

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA

Po Box 11889

Columbia, SC 29211-1889

Samuel Ross Beheler Shealy

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA

1201 Main Street, 22Nd Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Weldon Ray Johnson

Attorney at Barnes Alford Stork and Johnson

Po Box 8448

Columbia, SC 29202

Matthew Gregory Gerrald

Attorney at Barnes Alford Stork and Johnson

Po Box 8448

Columbia, SC 29202

Emily Collins Brown

Attorney at Barnes Alford Stork and Johnson

Po Box 8448

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) MOTION to Withdraw #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Josh Hatchell's Counterclaim, #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Charlie Schmitt's Counterclaim by Brandon A Schwarz. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#46

(#46) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Brandon A Schwarz.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/13/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

44 #1

Email from Attorney Shannon Polvi

33 #1

Memo in Support

#33

(#33) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Charlie Schmitt's Counterclaim by Brandon A Schwarz. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

32 #1

Memo in Support

#32

(#47) MOTION to Withdraw #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Josh Hatchell's Counterclaim, #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Charlie Schmitt's Counterclaim by Brandon A Schwarz. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

26 #1

Memo in Support

#26

(#46) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Brandon A Schwarz.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/13/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

5 #5

Affidavit of Service - Hartsville Police Department

5 #4

Certificate of Service - Edwin B. Pate

5 #3

Certificate of Service - William Timberlake, Registered Agent for Defendant Caro

5 #2

Certificate of Service - Josh Hatchell

5 #1

Certificate of Service - John M. Florence, Jr., Registered Agent for Defendant

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon A Schwarz. Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020; Hartsville Police Department served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; Josh Hatchell served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; Edwin B Pate served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; Sonoco Products Company served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service - John M. Florence, Jr., Registered Agent for Defendant Sonoco Products Company, #2 Certificate of Service - Josh Hatchell, #3 Certificate of Service - William Timberlake, Registered Agent for Defendant Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, #4 Certificate of Service - Edwin B. Pate, #5 Affidavit of Service - Hartsville Police Department) (Polvi, Shannon); Modified on 1/2/2020 to correct event type.(prou, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, Hartsville Police Department, Josh Hatchell, J Michaels Grill and Raw Bar LLC, Edwin B Pate, Bryan Michael Sansbury, Charlie Schmitt, Martha Libby Schmitt, Sonoco Products Company. (prou, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Brandon A Schwarz.(prou, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#1

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Brandon A Schwarz by Charlie Schmitt.(Stanton, James). Modified on 1/8/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION to Withdraw #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Josh Hatchell's Counterclaim, #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Charlie Schmitt's Counterclaim by Brandon A Schwarz. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Brandon A Schwarz.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/13/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Josh Hatchell's Counterclaim against Plaintiff Brandon Schwarz by Josh Hatchell (Attachments: #1 Email from Attorney Shannon Polvi); Modified on 2/5/2020 to correct event type. (prou, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Charlie Schmitt's Counterclaim against Plaintiff Brandon A. Schwarz by Charlie Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Email from Attorney Shannon Polvi); Modified on 2/5/2020 to correct event type.(prou, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Weldon Ray Johnson on behalf of Hartsville, LLC d/b/a Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center (Johnson, Weldon) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Attorney Shannon M. Polvi on January 27, 2020, filed by Charlie Schmitt. (Stanton, James) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Attorney Shannon M. Polvi on January 27, 2020, filed by Josh Hatchell. (Stanton, James) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Sonoco Products Company.(Shealy, Samuel) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/13/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/27/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/27/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/4/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/1/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/1/2020, Discovery due by 7/31/2020, Motions due by 8/17/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/29/2020, ADR Statement due by 9/14/2020, Mediation Due by 10/14/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to December 7, 2020. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after December 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/24/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Charlie Schmitt's Counterclaim by Brandon A Schwarz. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Polvi, Shannon) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Salley Millender on behalf of Brandon A Schwarz (Millender, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Plaintiff's Attorney, Shannon M. Polvi on January 6, 2020, filed by Josh Hatchell. (Stanton, James) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charlie Schmitt.(Stanton, James) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Brandon A Schwarz by Charlie Schmitt.(Stanton, James). Modified on 1/8/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Josh Hatchell.(Stanton, James) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Brandon A Schwarz by Josh Hatchell (Stanton, James). Modified on 1/6/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon A Schwarz. Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020; Hartsville Police Department served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; Josh Hatchell served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; Edwin B Pate served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; Sonoco Products Company served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service - John M. Florence, Jr., Registered Agent for Defendant Sonoco Products Company, #2 Certificate of Service - Josh Hatchell, #3 Certificate of Service - William Timberlake, Registered Agent for Defendant Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, #4 Certificate of Service - Edwin B. Pate, #5 Affidavit of Service - Hartsville Police Department) (Polvi, Shannon); Modified on 1/2/2020 to correct event type.(prou, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, Hartsville Police Department, Josh Hatchell, J Michaels Grill and Raw Bar LLC, Edwin B Pate, Bryan Michael Sansbury, Charlie Schmitt, Martha Libby Schmitt, Sonoco Products Company. (prou, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Brandon A Schwarz.(prou, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, Hartsville Police Department, Josh Hatchell, J Michaels Grill and Raw Bar LLC, Edwin B Pate, Bryan Michael Sansbury, Charlie Schmitt, Martha Libby Schmitt, Sonoco Products Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8822966.), filed by Brandon A Schwarz. Service due by 3/10/2020.(prou, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Hartsville Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where SONOCO PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Salley Millender