This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2022 at 07:03:23 (UTC).

SCHWARTZ v. TRANSUNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2021 SCHWARTZ filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TRANSUNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-20224

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINCHAS SCHWARTZ

Defendants

TRANSUNION, LLC

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAAKOV SAKS

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plazasuite 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601-2726

Defendant Attorneys

CASEY B. GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF PINCUS & GREEN

2700 Aramark Tower1101 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

CHRISTOPHER B. TURCOTTE

Attorney at TURCOTTE LAW, P.C.

575 Madison Avenue, Suite 1006

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., TRANSUNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PINCHAS SCHWARTZ. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PINCHAS SCHWARTZ. TRANSUNION, LLC served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY B. GREEN on behalf of TRANSUNION, LLC (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSUNION, LLC identifying TransUnion and TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#7

(#7) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by TRANSUNION, LLC. (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TRANSUNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER B. TURCOTTE on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#11

(#11) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#12

(#12) Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 3/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/7/2022. (eh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 3/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/7/2022. (eh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint submitted by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/11/2022. (jdb) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Clerk`s Text Order filed by the Clerk's Office on 12/28/2021 included the wrong date. Please disregard. (jdb) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint submitted by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/10/2022. (jdb) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER B. TURCOTTE on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TRANSUNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by TRANSUNION, LLC. (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSUNION, LLC identifying TransUnion and TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY B. GREEN on behalf of TRANSUNION, LLC (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PINCHAS SCHWARTZ. TRANSUNION, LLC served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PINCHAS SCHWARTZ. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., TRANSUNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketJudge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13004342) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PINCHAS SCHWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 11/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant