This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2019 at 07:25:01 (UTC).

Schwartz v. NRG Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 Schwartz filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against NRG Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Beatty and Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00909

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A. Beatty

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Schwartz

Defendant

NRG Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard P. Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorney

Michael R. Lieber

Attorney at Lieber Law Group, LLC

123 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for January, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NRG Media, LLC. (Lieber, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lieber on behalf of NRG Media, LLC (Lieber, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Schwartz. NRG Media, LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to NRG Media, LLC. (cjo) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Andrew Schwartz (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#4

(#4) AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cjo) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

2 #1

Consent Brochure

#2

(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-909-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

1 #5

Copyright Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NRG Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3958437.), filed by Andrew Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 8829. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/27/2019. (arf) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for January, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NRG Media, LLC.(Lieber, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NRG Media, LLC. (Lieber, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lieber on behalf of NRG Media, LLC (Lieber, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Schwartz. NRG Media, LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to NRG Media, LLC. (cjo) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Andrew Schwartz (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cjo) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Liebowitz does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-909-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NRG Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3958437.), filed by Andrew Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less