This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2019 at 07:20:18 (UTC).

Schwartz v. Cincinnati Life Insurance

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Schwartz filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Life Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01875

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joel Schwartz

Defendant

Cincinnati Life Insurance

Intervenor

Estate of Ricky Dean Cain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean P. O'Gorman

3350 Greenwood Blvd.

Maplewood, MO 63143

Andrew D. Sandroni

Attorney at O'GORMAN & SANDRONI

3350 Greenwood Boulevard

Maplewood, MO 63143

Defendant Attorneys

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES, P.C.

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Kelsey Leigh McLean

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES, P.C.

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Brandon B. Copeland

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES, P.C.

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Intervenor Attorney

Kurt Andrew Schmid

Attorney at KURT A. SCHMID, LLC

2209 S. 39Th St.

St. Louis, MO 63110

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kurt A. Schmid's motion to intervene is DENIED without prejudice, as set forth above. ECF No. 14. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 20, 2019. (MCB) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Estate of Ricky Dean Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Schmid, Kurt) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Estate of Ricky Dean Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Schmid, Kurt) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM Substitution of Counsel by Plaintiff Joel Schwartz. (Sandroni, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#12

(#12) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/17/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 2, 2019. (MCB) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew D. Sandroni for Plaintiff Joel Schwartz. (Sandroni, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Kelsey Leigh McLean for Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance. (McLean, Kelsey) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance Sent To: State Court - Executed (Bub, David) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE Disclosure of Corporation Interests Certificate: by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance (Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Breach of Contract by Cincinnati Life Insurance.(Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit D

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance Notice to Plaintiff Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter to attorney Sean O'Gorman from Clerk Re:Admission to the Bar (BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Joel Schwartz.(BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kurt A. Schmid's motion to intervene is DENIED without prejudice, as set forth above. ECF No. 14. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 20, 2019. (MCB) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Estate of Ricky Dean Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Schmid, Kurt) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Estate of Ricky Dean Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Schmid, Kurt) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM Substitution of Counsel by Plaintiff Joel Schwartz. (Sandroni, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/17/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 2, 2019. (MCB) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew D. Sandroni for Plaintiff Joel Schwartz. (Sandroni, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Kelsey Leigh McLean for Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance. (McLean, Kelsey) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance Sent To: State Court - Executed (Bub, David) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Disclosure of Corporation Interests Certificate: by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance (Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Breach of Contract by Cincinnati Life Insurance.(Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cincinnati Life Insurance Notice to Plaintiff Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to attorney Sean O'Gorman from Clerk Re:Admission to the Bar (BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Joel Schwartz.(BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 1922-CC04262, with receipt number AMOEDC-7311044, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cincinnati Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bub, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company is a litigant