Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2021 at 09:20:19 (UTC).

Schwartz et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Schwartz filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W Chesterton Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel, Gary L. Sharpe and David N. Hurd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01507

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judges

Gary L. Sharpe

David N. Hurd

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Cross Defendants

Theresa Schwartz

Gregory Schwartz

Respondents, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO.

Honeywell International, Inc.

Goodrich Corporation

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Raytheon Aircraft Co.

CBS Corporation

Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation

Raytheon CO.

Viacom Inc.

Pratt & Whitney Aircraft

Union Carbide Corporation

Parker Hannifin Corp.

A.W. Chesterton Company

Beech Aircraft Corp.

Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc.

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Theresa Schwartz

George Schwartz

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Lawrence G Lee

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

137 West 25Th Street - 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Timothy J. McHugh

Attorney at Lavin, O'Neil Law Firm - New York Office

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 335

New York, NY 10170

Michael A. Tanenbaum

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street - Suite 1301

Newark, NJ 07102

Dennis E. Vega

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street - Suite 1301

Newark, NJ 07102

Ezra H Alter

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC

Four Gateway Center - Suite 401, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Other Attorneys

David J. Goodearl

Attorney at Leader & Berkon LLP - NY Office

630 Third Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Erik C. DiMarco

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP - New York Office

1 Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Ave.

New York, NY 10178-0060

Austin David O'Malley

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

14 Wall Street, Ste 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Raghu N Bandlamudi

Attorney at Cullen, Dykman Law Firm - New York Office

44 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

66 #3

Exhibit(s)

66 #2

Exhibit(s)

66 #1

Memorandum of Law

#66

(#66) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Response to Motion due by 1/28/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/4/2021 filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (McHugh, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#65

(#65) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT LLC for Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc... (Bandlamudi, Raghu) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Raghu N Bandlamudi on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Bandlamudi, Raghu) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#63

(#63) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/3/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copies sent by regular email to counsel who have an admission requirement} (jmb) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#62

(#62) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for ITT LLC.. (Elkins, Patrick) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#61

(#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of ITT LLC (Elkins, Patrick) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, Boeing Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace, Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., IMO Industries Inc., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service).(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Austin David O'Malley on behalf of Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace, Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., IMO Industries Inc., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., George Schwartz, Theresa Schwartz, Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190135/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22272123).Document filed by Boeing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court).(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#67) TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16, Initial Conference in this case, has been reset for 3/10/2021 @ 10:00 AM, by telephone. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/3/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) This Court conference will be conducted by telephone and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/19/2021. (tab) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Response to Motion due by 1/28/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/4/2021 filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (McHugh, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT LLC for Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc... (Bandlamudi, Raghu) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Raghu N Bandlamudi on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Bandlamudi, Raghu) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/3/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copies sent by regular email to counsel who have an admission requirement} (jmb) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for ITT LLC.. (Elkins, Patrick) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of ITT LLC (Elkins, Patrick) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin David O'Malley on behalf of Boeing Co. (O'Malley, Austin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/14/2020. (jel, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: Christopher Gladd, Esq. for Plaintiffs', Telephone: (844)-230-7676, Email: cgladd@napolilaw.com; Austin David O'Malley, Esq. for Deft Boeing, Telephone: 212-364-2301, Email: aomalley@mgmlaw.com; Michael Alan Tanenbaum, Esq., for Deft CBS Corp. and General Electric Co., Telephone: 973-242-0002, Email: mtanenbau@tktrial.com; Joseph P. LaSala, Esq., Deft Rockwell Automation, Inc. Telephone: (212) 483-9490, Email: jlasala@mdmc-law.com; Raghu N Bandlamudi, Esq., Deft Goulds Pumps, Inc., Telephone: 212-701-4128, Email: rbandlamudi@cullenllp.com; Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins, Esq., Deft ITT LLC, Telephone: 212-309-6876, Email: patrick.elkins@morganlewis.com. Admissions due by 12/23/2020. {Copy sent to all counsel by email} (jmb) Modified on 12/9/2020 to update Atty Tanenbaum represents Defs. CPS Corp and General Electric, not Curtis-Wright Corp.(lmw). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Austin David O'Malley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: George Schwartz; CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation; GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY; Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace; Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp.; Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp.; Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly; party name was entered incorrectly. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc. for CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation..(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, Boeing Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace, Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., IMO Industries Inc., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service).(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Austin David O'Malley on behalf of Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace, Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., IMO Industries Inc., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., George Schwartz, Theresa Schwartz, Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190135/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22272123).Document filed by Boeing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court).(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAYTHEON AIRCRAFT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Pratt & Whitney Engine Services Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant