This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 07:26:50 (UTC).

SCHWAB v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 SCHWAB filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02817

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARY SCHWAB

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.

MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.

DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA S. KINCANNON

Attorney at WILENTZ, GOLDMAN & SPITZER, PA

90 Woodbridge Center Drive, Box 10

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

6 #3

Certificate of Service

6 #2

Exhibit 1 through 4 to M. Zogby Cert ISO Mot for Remand

6 #1

Certification of M. Zogby ISO Mot for Remand

6 #6

Main Document

4 #11

Text of Proposed Order

4 #10

Exhibit I

4 #9

Exhibit H

4 #8

Exhibit G

4 #7

Exhibit F

4 #6

Exhibit E

4 #5

Exhibit D

4 #4

Exhibit C

4 #3

Exhibit B

4 #2

Exhibit A - Cert. of I. Sayeg, Esq. in Support

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - Cert. of J Kincannon Esq. in Support

4 #4

Main Document

3 #3

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Brief

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Opposition filed by DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. re #4 Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court and Opposition to Stay (Attachments: #1 Certification of M. Zogby ISO Mot for Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 through 4 to M. Zogby Cert ISO Mot for Remand, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 7/5/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court and Opposition to Stay. Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #4 Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court and Opposition to Stay, #3 MOTION to Stay . (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court and Opposition to Stay by GARY SCHWAB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cert. of J Kincannon Esq. in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of I. Sayeg, Esq. in Support, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(KINCANNON, JOSHUA) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay by DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketJudge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdg) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. identifying JOHNSON & JOHNSON as Corporate Parent.. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-001836-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13409280), filed by DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Douglas K. Chia, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL C. ZOGBY