This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:34:33 (UTC).

Schupler v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Schupler filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00893

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stuart Schupler

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duncan Calvert Turner

Attorney at BADGLEY MULLINS TURNER PLLC

19929 Ballinger Way Ne, Ste 200

Seattle, WA 98155

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01119 ; 2:21-cv-01118, by Plaintiff Stuart Schupler. (Turner, Duncan) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7311646 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#8

(#8) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Parties' #8 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

CTO email

#11

(#11) Second MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 2); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (LH) (Order received for docketing on 12/22/2021. Re-transferring case upon request of receiving court) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2021)

12 #12

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

12 #1

*Restricted*

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01161. (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Second MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 2); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (LH) (Order received for docketing on 12/22/2021. Re-transferring case upon request of receiving court) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to the Western District of Missouri by electronic case transfer on 12/15/2021. (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting Parties' #8 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan, Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7311646 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein as related to C21-1119RSL. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01119 ; 2:21-cv-01118, by Plaintiff Stuart Schupler. (Turner, Duncan) [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7226125), filed by Stuart Schupler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turner, Duncan) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten PDF on 8/27/2021) (MET). [Transferred from wawd on 12/22/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less