This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:56:48 (UTC).

SCHUMACHER v. 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 SCHUMACHER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02421

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARE SCHUMACHER

Defendant

470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC doing business as ST. MARTHA'S CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

TIMOTHY S. SEILER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI

3331 Street Road Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

ANDREW OLCESE

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SUIT 128

Defendant Attorneys

ANGELA ALLEN CRONK

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

Suite 1418, 1700 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEREMY S. COLE

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

665 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED ATTORNEY FEES UNDER THE EAJA IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,500.00 AND COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $400. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/28/21. 7/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY S. COLE on behalf of 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC with Certificate of Service(COLE, JEREMY) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

6 #3

Exhibit A - Complaint

6 #2

Memorandum

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of CLARE SCHUMACHER (OLCESE, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. SEILER on behalf of CLARE SCHUMACHER (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC. 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (CRONK, ANGELA) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA ALLEN CRONK on behalf of 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC with Certificate of Service(CRONK, ANGELA) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15153836.), filed by CLARE SCHUMACHER.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED ATTORNEY FEES UNDER THE EAJA IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,500.00 AND COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $400. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/28/21. 7/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY S. COLE on behalf of 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC with Certificate of Service(COLE, JEREMY) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC.Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint)(CRONK, ANGELA) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of CLARE SCHUMACHER (OLCESE, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. SEILER on behalf of CLARE SCHUMACHER (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC. 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (CRONK, ANGELA) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA ALLEN CRONK on behalf of 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC with Certificate of Service(CRONK, ANGELA) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/27/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by CLARE SCHUMACHER. (md, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 470 MANOR OPERATING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15153836.), filed by CLARE SCHUMACHER.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGELA ALLEN CRONK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy S. Cole